5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?

来源:学生作业帮助网 编辑:作业帮 时间:2017/12/12 16:35:19
5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?5×25×75×64=5×25×75×4×4×4=5×4×25×4×75×4=20×100×300

5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?
5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?

5×25×75×64怎么简便运算?
5×25×75×64
=5×25×75×4×4×4
=5×4×25×4×75×4
=20×100×300
=600000

5×25×75×64
=5×25×3×25×2×4×4×2
=(5×2)×(25×4)×(25×4)×3×2
=10×100×100×6
=600000

=5X25X75X4X8X2 (把64分成8X4X2)
=(5X8)X(25X4)X(75X2)
=40X100X150
=4000X150
=600000